EP0533809 - POLYURETHANE-BIOPOLYMER COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VITAPHORE CORPORATION 1505 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [1993/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOOTMAN, Matthew 2536 Hampton Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Ronald 484 15th Avenue Atherton, CA 94025 / US | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91911897.6 | 14.06.1991 | [1993/13] | WO1991US04095 | Priority number, date | US19900539990 | 14.06.1990 Original published format: US 539990 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119470 | Date: | 26.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533809 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533809 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.12.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, A61K47/48, A61L29/00, A61L15/26, A61L15/42 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
A61L15/325 (EP);
A61K47/38 (EP);
A61K47/42 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61L15/28 (EP);
A61L15/32 (EP);
A61L15/44 (EP);
A61L15/46 (EP);
A61L15/60 (EP);
A61L27/52 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/6446 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L15/60, C08L5/04 (EP);
A61L15/60, C08L75/04 (EP);
A61L27/52, C08L5/04 (EP);
A61L27/52, C08L77/04 (EP); |
Former IPC [1993/13] | A61F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | POLYURETHAN-BIOPOLYMER VERBINDUNG | [1993/13] | English: | POLYURETHANE-BIOPOLYMER COMPOSITE | [1993/13] | French: | COMPOSITE DE POLYURETHANE-BIOPOLYMERE | [1993/13] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/31: (deleted) | EPB 1997/31: (deleted) | EPB 1997/31: (deleted) | EPB 1997/13: Teilanmeldung 96203619.0 eingereicht am 30/12/96 | EPB 1997/13: Divisional application 96203619.0 filed on 30/12/96 | EPB 1997/13: Demande divisionnaire 96203619.0 déposée le 30/12/96 | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1992 | Search fee paid | 28.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 22.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01200967.6 / EP1120112 | EP96203619.0 / EP0797965 | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Request for further processing for: | 30.12.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.1997 | ES | 30.07.1997 | GR | 30.07.1997 | IT | 30.07.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 30.07.1997 | |
ES | 30.07.1997 | ||
GR | 30.07.1997 | ||
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 30.07.1997 | |
GR | 30.07.1997 | ||
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 30.07.1997 | |
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 30.07.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2748882 (RAVA ARNIS DR MED) [X] 17 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0048558 (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH]) [X] 32 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 19 * * page 7, line 14 - line 32 * * page 14 - page 15; example 1 *; | [X]WO8401102 (HYDROMER INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 5 - page 6; example 1 *; | [A]EP0161043 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 12, line 5 - line 8 ** page 14; example 5 *; | [A]EP0224987 (BIOMATRIX INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 24 - page 26; example 11 *; | [X]US4847049 (YAMAMOTO RONALD [US]) [X] 32,33 * column 6; example 1 *; | [A]EP0341745 (FIDIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 30; example 40 * | International search | [Y]US4814182 (GRAHAM NEIL B [GB], et al) |