EP0487692 - METHOD OF, AND APPARATUS FOR, BONING A HEAD OF A SLAUGHTERED PIECE OF LIVESTOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORK PROTECON-LANGEN B.V. Industrielaan 63 5349 AE 0SS / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states STORK PROTECON-LANGEN B.V. Industrielaan 63 NL-5349 AE 0SS / NL | ||
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states STORK PROTECON B.V. Industrielaan 63 NL-5349 AE Oss / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOREN, Bauke Gasselterweg 46 NL-9461 TM Gieten / NL | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J. Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1992/23] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, P.O. Box 87930 NL-2508 DH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91911907.3 | 18.06.1991 | [1992/23] | WO1991NL00100 | Priority number, date | NL19900001382 | 18.06.1990 Original published format: NL 9001382 | [1992/23] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119422 | Date: | 26.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487692 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487692 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A22C17/02, A22B5/20 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
A22C17/004 (EP);
A22B5/0052 (EP);
A22C17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTBEINEN VON KÖPFEN EINES SCHLACHTTIERSTÜCKES | [1992/23] | English: | METHOD OF, AND APPARATUS FOR, BONING A HEAD OF A SLAUGHTERED PIECE OF LIVESTOCK | [1992/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DESOSSER LA TETE D'UNE PIECE DE BETAIL ABBATUE | [1992/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1992 | Translation filed | 17.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.1995 | BE | 13.12.1995 | CH | 13.12.1995 | DK | 13.12.1995 | FR | 13.12.1995 | GR | 13.12.1995 | LI | 13.12.1995 | SE | 13.03.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 13.12.1995 | |
BE | 13.12.1995 | ||
CH | 13.12.1995 | ||
DK | 13.12.1995 | ||
GR | 13.12.1995 | ||
LI | 13.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.03.1996 | ||
FR | 10.05.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.12.1995 | |
BE | 13.12.1995 | ||
CH | 13.12.1995 | ||
DK | 13.12.1995 | ||
LI | 13.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.03.1996 | ||
FR | 10.05.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 13.12.1995 | |
BE | 13.12.1995 | ||
CH | 13.12.1995 | ||
LI | 13.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.03.1996 | ||
FR | 10.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 13.12.1995 | |
BE | 13.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.03.1996 | ||
FR | 10.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | BE | 13.12.1995 | |
SE | 13.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 13.12.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2014430 (CROASDELL DESMOND FRANCIS); | [A]FR2428979 (KORHONEN KAARLO [SE]); | [A]US4414708 (SAUVAGO PHILLIP J [US]); | [A]EP0197615 (BRUIL DIRK JOHAN); | [A]WO8807329 (PASSCHIER BOB [IE]); | [A]NL8701609 (TORENCO B V); | [A]EP0309296 (NEW ZEALAND MEAT IND RES INST [NZ]) |