EP0536227 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING PMOS-TRANSISTORS AND PMOS-TRANSISTORS THUS PRODUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EL-MOS ELEKTRONIK IN MOS-TECHNOLOGIE GmbH Emil-Figge-Strasse 81 D-44227 Dortmund / DE | [1993/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTH, Walter Am Oelspeler Dorney 2 D-4600 Dortmund 1 / DE | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | Dallmeyer, Georg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 91911911.5 | 22.06.1991 | [1993/15] | WO1991EP01157 | Priority number, date | DE19904020076 | 23.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4020076 | [1993/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200608 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536227 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536227 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/784, H01L21/266, H01L21/336 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
H01L21/266 (EP);
H01L29/66659 (EP);
H01L29/7835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PMOS-TRANSISTORS, SOWIE PMOS-TRANSISTOR | [1993/15] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING PMOS-TRANSISTORS AND PMOS-TRANSISTORS THUS PRODUCED | [1993/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTORS M.O.S. POSITIFS ET TRANSISTORS M.O.S. POSITIFS AINSI PRODUITS | [1993/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 16.12.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1993 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.09.1994 | [2002/25] | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP62245675 ; | [X]DE2636214 (IBM); | [X]FR2216676 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2331884 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 115 (E-599)12. April 1988 & JP,A,62 245 675 ( CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD ) 26. Oktober 1987 siehe Zusammenfassung, & JP62245675 A 00000000 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. Bd. 26, Nr. 6, November 1983, NEW YORK US Seiten 2682 - 2683; D.A. BADAMI ET AL.: 'Tapered photoresist for a doping profile' siehe das ganze Dokument |