EP0533824 - PIPERIDYL-SUBSTITUTED INDOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Lundbeck A/S Ottiliavej 7-9 2500 Kobenhavn-Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states H. LUNDBECK A/S Ottiliavej 7-9 DK-2500 Kobenhavn-Valby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERREGAARD, Jens, Kristian Thyrasvej 22 DK-3630 Jaegerspris / DK | 02 /
COSTALL, Brenda University of Bradford, Richmond Rd. Bradford BD7 1DP / GB | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Meidahl Petersen, John, et al c/o H. Lundbeck A/S Patent Department Ottiliavej 7-9 2500 Copenhagen-Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Petersen, John Meidahl, et al c/o H. Lundbeck A/S Patent Department Ottiliavej 7-9 DK-2500 Copenhagen-Valby / DK | Application number, filing date | 91912147.5 | 21.06.1991 | [1993/13] | WO1991DK00168 | Priority number, date | DK19900001520 | 22.06.1990 Original published format: DK 152090 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200070 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533824 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533824 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, C07D401/14, C07D401/04, C07D411/14 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | PIPERIDYL-SUBSTITUIERTE INDOLE | [1993/13] | English: | PIPERIDYL-SUBSTITUTED INDOLES | [1993/13] | French: | INDOLES DE PIPERIDYLE SUBSTITUES | [1993/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1438094 (ROUSSEL UCLAF); | [A]EP0007258 (PHARMUKA LAB [FR]); | [XA]US4710500 (PERREGAARD JENS K [DK]) |