EP0489141 - MANUFACTURE OF POLYMERIC FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unifoam AG Kirchweg 54 CH-8750 Glarus / CH | [1992/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAREUTER, Gerd Veenendaal Schaumstoffwerk GmbH, Bamberger Str. 58 D-8620 Lichtenfels-Senbelsdorf / DE | 02 /
FERNANDEZ, Carlos, c/o ICOA SA, Carretera Andalucia Km.17.5, Poligono Industrial Las Arenas, Ronda 5 Madrid / ES | 03 /
TETLOW, Jack Vita Services Limited, Middleton Manchester M24 2DB / GB | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91912226.7 | 21.06.1991 | [1992/24] | WO1991EP01166 | Priority number, date | GB19900014331 | 27.06.1990 Original published format: GB 9014331 | [1992/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200184 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489141 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489141 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/00 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
B29C44/467 (EP,US);
B29C44/321 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1142 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/24] | B29C67/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/24] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMERENSCHAUMSTOFF | [1992/24] | English: | MANUFACTURE OF POLYMERIC FOAM | [1992/24] | French: | FABRICATION DE MOUSSE POLYMERE | [1992/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.1996
17.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE MASCHINENFABRIK HENNECKE GMBH Bilinghovener Strasse 30 D-53754 Sankt Augustin / DE Opponent's representative Drope, Rüdiger Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.1996
17.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE MASCHINENFABRIK HENNECKE GMBH Bilinghovener Strasse 30 D-53754 Sankt Augustin / DE Opponent's representative Drope, Rüdiger Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | 12.07.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.09.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 03.11.1996 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP63224928 ; | [A]EP0000058 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]US4492664 (BRUNO MELLE [IT]) | [A] - DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD AN-88-304632 [43] , DW& JP,A,63 224 928 (DAINIPPON) September 20, 1988 see the whole document, & JP63224928 A 00000000 |