EP0498861 - HYDRAULIC BRAKE SYSTEM WITH BRAKE AND/OR DRIVE SLIP CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20 D-60441 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GMBH Guerickestrasse 7 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 90 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINARTZ, Hans-Dieter In der Römerstadt 169 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE | 02 /
STEFFES, Helmut Am See 22 D-6234 Hattersheim 3 / DE | [1992/34] | Application number, filing date | 91912570.8 | 03.07.1991 | [1992/34] | WO1991EP01243 | Priority number, date | DE19904027565 | 31.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4027565 | [1992/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9204215 | Date: | 19.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498861 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498861 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/40, B60T8/48 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
B60T8/4827 (EP,US);
B60T8/34 (EP,US);
B60T8/4018 (EP,US);
B60T8/404 (EP,US);
B60T8/445 (EP,US);
Y10S303/901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/34] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE BREMSANLAGE MIT EINER EINRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DES BREMS- UND/ODER ANTRIEBSSCHLUPFES | [1992/34] | English: | HYDRAULIC BRAKE SYSTEM WITH BRAKE AND/OR DRIVE SLIP CONTROL DEVICE | [1992/34] | French: | SYSTEME HYDRAULIQUE DE FREINAGE A REGULATEUR DU GLISSEMENT AU FREINAGE ET/OU A L'ENTRAINEMENT | [1993/31] |
Former [1992/34] | SYSTEME HYDRAULIQUE DE FREINAGE A REGULATEUR DU GLISSEMENT AU FREINAGE ET/OU A L'ENTRA NEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP1301448 ; | [A]JP61113545 ; | [A]GB2186647 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED); | [A]EP0253157 (BORRUTO DOMINIQUE); | [A]DE3731636 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Band 14, Nr. 91 (M-938)[4034], 20. Februar 1990, & JP, A, 1301448 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND. CO.) 5. Dezember 1989, siehe das ganze Dokument, & JP1301448 A 00000000 | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Band 10, Nr. 301 (M-525)[2357], 14. Oktober 1986, & JP, A, 61113545 (NIPPON AIR BRAKE CO.) 31. Mai 1986, siehe das ganze Dokument, & JP61113545 A 00000000 |