EP0532683 - HEAT ACCUMULATOR, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND ENERGY SYSTEM PROVIDED WITH SUCH A HEAT ACCUMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE BEIJER RAADGEVEND TECHNISCH BUREAU B.V. Meijnerswijk 5 6841 HA Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states DE BEIJER RAADGEVEND TECHNISCH BUREAU B.V. Meijnerswijk 5 NL-6841 HA Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states DE BEIJER RAADGEVEND TECHNISCH BUREAU B.V. Meijnerswijk 5 NL-6841 HA Arnhem / NL | ||
For all designated states DE BEIJER, Hendrikus, Antonius Klokkenpas 3 NL-6851 CM Huissen / NL | |||
For all designated states KLEIN HORSMAN, Jan, Willem Meerlandpad 18 NL-6835 BV Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BEIJER, Hendrikus, Antonius Klokkenpas 3 NL-6851 CM Huissen / NL | 02 /
KLEIN HORSMAN, Jan, Willem Meerlandpad 18 NL-6835 BV Arnhem / NL | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 91912600.3 | 06.06.1991 | [1993/12] | WO1991NL00093 | Priority number, date | NL19900001289 | 07.06.1990 Original published format: NL 9001289 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119154 | Date: | 12.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532683 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532683 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F28D20/00 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
F28D20/003 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/12] | Title | German: | WÄRMESPEICHER, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND MIT EINEM SOLCHEN WÄRMESPEICHER VERSEHENES ENERGIESYSTEM | [1993/12] | English: | HEAT ACCUMULATOR, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND ENERGY SYSTEM PROVIDED WITH SUCH A HEAT ACCUMULATOR | [1993/12] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR DE CHALEUR, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, ET SYSTEME ENERGETIQUE MUNI D'UN TEL ACCUMULATEUR DE CHALEUR | [1993/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1995 | BE | 27.12.1995 | DK | 27.12.1995 | ES | 27.12.1995 | GR | 27.12.1995 | SE | 27.03.1996 | CH | 30.06.1996 | LI | 30.06.1996 | LU | 30.06.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 30.06.1996 | ||
LI | 30.06.1996 | ||
LU | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
DK | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 30.06.1996 | ||
LI | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 30.06.1996 | ||
LI | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
BE | 27.12.1995 | ||
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | BE | 27.12.1995 | |
SE | 27.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 27.12.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1029877 (S E R A M); | [Y]DE2622699 (SULZER AG); | [A]GB2010468 (WALLSTEN H); | [Y]US4169362 (DUFOUR RAYMOND J [US], et al); | [A]EP0035871 (THERMAL ENERGY STORAGE INC [US]); | [A]US4341262 (ALSPAUGH THOMAS R); | [A]US4403643 (MINTO WALLACE L [US]); | [A]DE3612781 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al); | [A]WO8900271 (INT THERMAL PACKAGING INC [US]) |