EP0536281 - PAPERMAKING BELT AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME USING A TEXTURED CASTING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMURKOSKI, John Andrew RD 2, Box 264 Meshoppen, PA 18630 / US | 02 /
LEGGITT, Gary Lindsey RD 1, Box 266 Springville, PA 18844 / US | 03 /
WILSON, Gregory Lynn 3106 New Year Drive Cincinnati, OH 45239 / US | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Bérogin, Francis, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Bérogin, Francis, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1993/44] | Bérogin, Francis, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/15] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91912749.8 | 14.06.1991 | [1993/15] | WO1991US04248 | Priority number, date | US19900546350 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: US 546350 | [1993/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200414 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536281 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536281 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D21F11/00 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
B29C35/10 (EP,US);
D21F11/00 (KR,US);
B29C43/222 (EP,US);
B29C43/28 (EP,US);
D21F11/006 (EP,US);
D21F3/00 (US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0002 (EP,US);
B29L2031/733 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/15] | Title | German: | BAND FÜR DIE PAPIERFABRIKATION UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER TEXTURIERTEN GUSSFORMOBERFLÄCHE | [1993/15] | English: | PAPERMAKING BELT AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME USING A TEXTURED CASTING SURFACE | [1993/15] | French: | COURROIE DE MACHINE A PAPIER ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION AU MOYEN D'UNE SURFACE DE MOULAGE TEXTUREE | [1993/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3549742 (BENZ CHARLES S); | [A]FR2538298 (BRECO KUNSTSTOFF [DE], et al); | [Y]US4514345 (JOHNSON BRUCE A [US], et al); | [Y]US4528239 (TROKHAN PAUL D [US]); | [A]US4552620 (ADAMS RICHARD J [US]); | [Y]EP0168530 (DOCDATA BV [NL]); | [A]EP0211426 (WANGNER GMBH CO KG HERMANN [DE]) |