|
13.04.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.06.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
24.07.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.07.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.07.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.10.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.10.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
49 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
70 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
50 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
116 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
33 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2000 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
25 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
116 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
63 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
49 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
33 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
03.05.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.09.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.08.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.07.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.03.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
38 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
46 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
55 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1997 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
76 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
102 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
126 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
21 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
36 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
364 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
70 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
270 |
|
12.08.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
124 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
30.06.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.08.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.1996 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
178 |
|
05.07.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
157 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
11.06.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.10.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.10.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.10.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.10.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.05.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1995 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.09.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.07.1994 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1994 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.1994 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1994 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1993 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1993 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1993 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.1992 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.1992 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1992 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
256 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
130 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
156 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
16.08.1991 |
Notification of designations |
Search / examination |
1 |