EP0495114 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Koji 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392 / JP | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 91913114.4 | 25.07.1991 | [1992/30] | WO1991JP01001 | Priority number, date | JP19900198797 | 26.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19879790 | [1992/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9202051 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495114 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
H10B53/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/30] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG | [1992/30] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [1992/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF A SEMICONDUCTEUR | [1992/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1992 | Translation filed | 17.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.1992 | Search fee paid | 17.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 28.04.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4149301 (COOK ROBERT C); | [A]DE3602887 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0417341 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING 1987 6 December 1987, WASHINGTON USA pages 850 - 851; W.I. KINNEY ET AL.: 'A non-volatile memory cell based on ferroelectric storage capacitors' | International search | JPS644721 [ ] (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | JPH02183570 [ ] (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |