EP0565524 - AN IMPROVED FABRIC STAND FOR USE IN A VAMATEX LOOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEIL INDUSTRIES INC. 105, Chimsan-dong, Buk-ku Taegu 702-050 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states CHEIL INDUSTRIES INC. 105, Chimsan-dong, Buk-ku Taegu 702-050 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Oh Taek 263, Inpyung 3 Dong, BukSam-Myun, Chilkok-Goon KyungSangBuk-do 718-840 / KR | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Marchi, Massimo, et al c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91913382.7 | 11.07.1991 | [1993/42] | WO1991KR00017 | Priority number, date | KR19900021739 | 26.12.1990 Original published format: KR 9021739 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212280 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565524 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D03D49/00, D03J1/00 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
D03D49/00 (EP);
D03J1/00 (EP);
D03J1/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER GEWEBESTÄNDER ZUM GEBRAUCH IN EINER VAMATEX-WEBMASCHINE | [1993/42] | English: | AN IMPROVED FABRIC STAND FOR USE IN A VAMATEX LOOM | [1993/42] | French: | ENSOUPLE AMELIOREE POUR TISSUS DESTINEE A UN METIER VAMATEX | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 01.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/34] | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0224850 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]EP0292429 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]US4890971 (HEGER WINFRIED [DE]) |