EP0495944 - METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A RUBBER-CONTAINING PAINT OR ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/31] | METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF PAINT AND ADHESIVE RUBBER FROM VULCANIZED RUBBER | ||
[1995/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLIVEIRA DA CUNHA LIMA, Luiz Carlos Rua Pacheco Leao 606, Casa 107, Jardim Botânico 22460 Rio de Janeiro / BR | [1992/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A. 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375 CH-1211 Genève 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 91913938.6 | 24.07.1991 | [1992/31] | WO1991BR00014 | Priority number, date | BR19909003626 | 26.07.1990 Original published format: BR 9003626 | [1992/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201760 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495944 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495944 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09J117/00, C08J11/20, C08J11/06, C08J11/10, C08J7/02, C08J3/12, C09D117/00 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
C09D117/00 (EP,US);
C09J117/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GUMMIHALTIGER FARBE ODER GUMMIHALTIGEM KLEBSTOFF | [1995/49] | English: | METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A RUBBER-CONTAINING PAINT OR ADHESIVE | [1995/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PEINTURE OU D'ADHESIF A PARTIR DE CAOUTCHOUC VULCANISE | [1995/49] |
Former [1992/31] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FARBE UND KLEBENDEM GUMMI AUS VULKANISIERTEM GUMMI | ||
Former [1992/31] | METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF PAINT AND ADHESIVE RUBBER FROM VULCANIZED RUBBER | ||
Former [1992/31] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PEINTURE ET DE CAOUTCHOUC ADHESIF A PARTIR DE CAOUTCHOUC VULCANISE | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP66B ; | [Y]JP50 ; | [A]WO8605192 (OLIVEIRA DA CUNHA LIMA LUIZ CA) | [Y] - Derwent Acession No. 68-639 51P (WPI) & JP, B, 66/11 629 (HAYAKAWA GOMU K.K.) 1966 (66)., & JP66B B 00000000 | [Y] - Derwent Acession No. 77-315 13Y (WPI) & JP, A, 50/98 987 (TOYO RUBBER IND. K.K.) 06 August 1975 (06.08.75)., & JP50 A 19750806 |