EP0540640 - COMBINED RIGID AND FLEXIBLE PRINTED CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miraco, Inc. 109 Northeastern Boulevard Nashua New Hampshire 03061 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states Miraco, Inc. 109 Northeastern Boulevard Nashua New Hampshire 03061 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeMASO, Arthur, J. 44 Townsend Road Pepperell, MA 01463 / US | 02 /
STEARNS, Thomas, H. 3 Brander Court Nashua, NH 03063 / US | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co., 1623 Warwick Road Knowle, Solihull, West Midlands B93 9LF / GB | Application number, filing date | 91914079.8 | 22.07.1991 | [1993/19] | WO1991US05163 | Priority number, date | US19900557526 | 24.07.1990 Original published format: US 557526 | US19910676877 | 28.03.1991 Original published format: US 676877 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9202115 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540640 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/00, H05K1/00 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
H05K3/4691 (EP,US);
H05K1/0366 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0154 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0909 (EP,US);
Y10S428/901 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49165 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/19] | H05K1/00, H05K1/11 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/19] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE STARRE- UND FLEXIBLE LEITERPLATTEN | [1993/19] | English: | COMBINED RIGID AND FLEXIBLE PRINTED CIRCUITS | [1993/19] | French: | CIRCUITS IMPRIMES DE TYPES RIGIDE ET FLEXIBLE COMBINES | [1993/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1993 | Search fee paid | 11.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 08.09.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2063571 (KOLLMORGEN TECH CORP); | [X]EP0195935 (PPC ELECTRONIC AG [CH]); | [X]US4900878 (ICHKHAN ELIE J [US]); | [X] - "RELIABLE PLATED THROUGH HOLES FOR RIGID FLEX BOARDS.", ELECTRONIC PACKAGING AND PRODUCTION., CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO, NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS., US, US, (19880901), vol. 28., no. 09., ISSN 0013-4945, pages 42 - 45., XP000000546 | [X] - FEINWERKTECHNIK + MESSTECHNIK vol. 84, no. 7, October/November 1976, MUENCHEN DE pages 317 - 320 ACKERMANN ET AL. 'Starr-flexible Mehrlagenleiterplatten: Dreidimensionale gedruckte Schaltungen ermöglichen eine weitere Miniaturisierung und erhöhen die Zuverlässigkeit' | [X] - ELECTRONICS vol. 43, no. 4, 16 February 1970, NEW YORK US pages 116 - 121 GRUENINGER 'Multilayer p-c boards are both rigid and flexible in all the right places' | International search | [A]US4800461 (DIXON HERBERT S [US], et al); | [A]US4931134 (HATKEVITZ ZVI [US], et al); | [YP]US4997702 (GAZIT SAMUEL [US], et al); | [XP]US5004639 (DESAI JAY [US]) |