EP0535160 - INTRAOPERATIVE BETA PROBE AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 300 Lakeside Drive 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | ||
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZZIOTTA, John, C. 151-1/2 Bedford Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90212 / US | 02 /
DAGHIGHIAN, Farhad 504 East 63rd Street, Apt. 26-S New-York, 10021 / US | 03 /
HOFFMAN, Edward, J. 5446 Burnet Avenue Van Nuys, CA 91411 / US | [1993/27] |
Former [1993/14] | 01 /
MAZZIOTTA, John, C. 10111 Angelo View Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90201 / US | ||
02 /
DAGHIGHIAN, Farhad 504 East 63rd Street, Apt. 26-S New-York, 10021 / US | |||
03 /
HOFFMAN, Edward, J. 5446 Burnet Avenue Van Nuys, CA 91411 / US | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91914163.0 | 26.04.1991 | [1993/14] | WO1991US02877 | Priority number, date | US19900539794 | 18.06.1990 Original published format: US 539794 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119998 | Date: | 26.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535160 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535160 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.12.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/161, G01T1/20 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
A61B6/425 (EP,US);
A61B6/4258 (EP,US);
G01T1/161 (EP,US);
G01T1/169 (EP,US);
G01T1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/17] |
Former [1993/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | INTRAOPERATIVER BETA-MESSFÜHLER UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DESSELBEN | [1993/14] | English: | INTRAOPERATIVE BETA PROBE AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [1993/14] | French: | SONDE BETA PEROPERATOIRE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE CETTE SONDE | [1993/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1992 | Search fee paid | 28.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 05.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Request for further processing for: | 26.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.1993 | 30.04.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.1994 | 01.05.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4156139 (BINGO KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 7 - line 23 ** figure - *; | [Y]US4267446 (BROWN ROBERT, et al) [Y] 1-20 * column A * * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 63 * * column 10, line 15 - line 27 * * column 10, line 35 - column 11, line 7 * * figure -; claim 1 *; | [YD] - HICKERNELL T S ET AL., "dual detector probe for surgical tumor staging", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, NEW YORK USA, (198806), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 1101 - 1106, XP000119860 [YD] 1-20 * the entire document * |