EP0551287 - SAFETY SYRINGE NEEDLE DEVICE WITH INTERCHANGEABLE AND RETRACTABLE NEEDLE PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVIRO MEDICAL DEVICES LTD. Chancery Chambers Chancery House High Street Bridgetown / BB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states INVIRO MEDICAL DEVICES LTD. Chancery Chambers Chancery House High Street Bridgetown / BB | ||
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states PATCO VENTURES LIMITED 1188 Thurlow Street Vancouver, British Columbia / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOVACEK, Laurel, A. 4063 West 20th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1G6 / CA | 02 /
SHARP, Fraser, R. 1830 Greer Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6I 1C5 / CA | 03 /
MCLEAN, Donald, A. 4486 West 6th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6R 1V3 / CA | [1993/29] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91915398.1 | 10.09.1991 | [1993/29] | WO1991CA00321 | Priority number, date | US19900607127 | 03.10.1990 Original published format: US 607127 | US19910687108 | 18.04.1991 Original published format: US 687108 | [1993/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9205821 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551287 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551287 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/50, A61M5/32 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
A61M5/3202 (EP,US);
A61L2/28 (EP,US);
A61M5/322 (EP,US);
A61M5/5086 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3101 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3104 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3106 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3118 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3121 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3223 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3224 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3231 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3279 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M5/002 (EP,US);
A61M5/347 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/29] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSPRITZE MIT AUSTAUSCHBAREM UND EINZIEHBAREM NADELTRäGER | [1997/05] | English: | SAFETY SYRINGE NEEDLE DEVICE WITH INTERCHANGEABLE AND RETRACTABLE NEEDLE PLATFORM | [1993/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE POUR AIGUILLE DE SERINGUE A PORTE-AIGUILLE INTERCHANGEABLE ET RETRACTILE | [1993/29] |
Former [1993/29] | SICHERHEITSSPRITZE MIT AUSTAUSCHBAREM UND EINZIEBAREM NADELTRÄGER | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 30.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 27.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 01.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Request for further processing for: | 23.10.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 23.10.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.1996 | Decision despatched | 11.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 28.03.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 10.09.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/06] | LU | 30.09.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4747830 (GLOYER WALTER W [US], et al); | [Y]EP0327061 (BLAKE JOSEPH W III [US], et al); | [X]US4861338 (MATHIESEN GEORGE E [US], et al); | [Y]WO8908468 (TERUMO CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0347742 (VENTURINI ALDO); | [A]WO8912475 (ALTERON INC [US]); | [Y]US4955870 (RIDDERHEIM KRISTEN A [US], et al); | [XP]WO9011099 (NOVACEK LAUREL A [CA], et al) |