EP0536336 - APPARATUS FOR ELIMINATING FOCUS/TRACKING CROSSTALK IN AN OPTICAL DISK DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAXOPTIX CORPORATION 2520 Junction Avenue San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [1995/41] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states MAXTOR CORPORATION 211 River Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURROUGHS, Alan, C. 851 Arnold Way San Jose, CA 95128 / US | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91916329.5 | 26.06.1991 | [1993/15] | WO1991US04596 | Priority number, date | US19900544690 | 27.06.1990 Original published format: US 544690 | [1993/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200587 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536336 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.01.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/085 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
G11B7/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/47] |
Former [1993/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR AUSSCHALTUNG VON FOKUS/SPURFOLGENEBENSPRECHUNG IN EINEM OPTISCHEN SCHEIBEANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [1993/15] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ELIMINATING FOCUS/TRACKING CROSSTALK IN AN OPTICAL DISK DRIVE SYSTEM | [1993/15] | French: | APPAREIL D'ELIMINATION DE DIAPHONIE DE FOCALISATION/SUIVI DANS UN SYSTEME D'UNITE DE DISQUE OPTIQUE | [1993/15] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1993 | Search fee paid | 27.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 28.01.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IT, LU, SE | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/32] | 23.03.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.02.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1993 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1993 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0284377 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4802153 (KATAOKA KEIJI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US4918680 (MIYASAKA TOSHIYUKI [JP]); | [A]US4661942 (YOSHIMOTO KYOSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US4707648 (MINAMI AKIRA [JP]); | [AE]US5034940 (SAITO ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4544838 (MUSHA TORU [JP], et al); | [A]US4783590 (AOI SHIGERU [JP]); | [A]US4742506 (FUKUMOTO ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4764912 (ANDO HIDEO [JP], et al); | [A]US4814903 (KULAKOWSKI JOHN E [US], et al); | [A]US4825428 (TOKI KAORU [JP]); | [A]US4730289 (SAITOH ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4844617 (KELDERMAN HERMAN F [US], et al) |