|
08.09.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
22.08.2001 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2000 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1997 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.09.1997 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.07.1997 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
10.07.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.07.1997 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
02.05.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.10.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.1996 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1993 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.1993 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
08.04.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1992 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
05.03.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
94 |
|
05.03.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
05.03.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
15.10.1991 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |