EP0549643 - AUTOMOTIVE CLEAR COATING COMPOSITION OF AN ACRYLOSILANE, ACRYLIC POLYOL AND CROSSLINKING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAZAN, Isidor Apt. 579 Millbridge Clementon, NJ 08021 / US | 02 /
RUMMEL, Mitzie Kristine 4 Winterberry Court Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054 / US | [1994/36] |
Former [1993/27] | 01 /
HAZAN, Isidor Apt. 579 Millbridge Clementon, NJ 08021 / US | ||
02 /
RUMMEL, Mitzie, Kristine 4 Winterberry Court Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054 / US | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/27] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91916371.7 | 17.09.1991 | [1993/27] | WO1991US06589 | Priority number, date | US19900582655 | 17.09.1990 Original published format: US 582655 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205225 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549643 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0549643 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/08, C09D133/10 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
C09D133/14 (EP);
C09D143/04 (EP);
C08L33/066 (EP);
C08L43/04 (EP);
C08L61/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D133/14, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09D143/04, C08L2666/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/29] |
Former [1993/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | SELBSTTÄTIGE, KLARE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS ACRYLSILAN, ACRYLPOLYOL UND VERNETZUNGSMITTEL | [1993/27] | English: | AUTOMOTIVE CLEAR COATING COMPOSITION OF AN ACRYLOSILANE, ACRYLIC POLYOL AND CROSSLINKING AGENT | [1993/27] | French: | COMPOSITION TRANSPARENTE POUR LE REVETEMENT DES VEHICULES MOTORISES, RENFERMANT UN ACRYLOSILANE, UN POLYOL ACRYLIQUE ET UN AGENT DE RETICULATION | [1993/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | - Derwent's abstract, No. 77-73 476/41, JP 520 104 542, publ.week 7741 (KUBOKO PAINT KK ET AL.) | - Derwent's abstract, No. 76-21 725/12, JP 510 014 934, publ. week 7612 (SAIDEN CHEMICAL IND CO) | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 68, C 48, abstract of JP 54-43243, publ 1979-05-04 (KANSAI PAINT K.K.) |