EP0550507 - INDOLE UREAS AS 5 HT RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beecham Group p.l.c. SB House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states Beecham Group p.l.c. SB House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORBES, Ian Thomson SmithKline Beecham Pharm., Coldharbour Road The Pinnacles, Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 02 /
MARTIN, Roger Thomas SmithKline Beecham Pharm., Coldharbour Road The Pinnacles, Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Giddings, Peter John GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr. SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 91916525.8 | 11.09.1991 | [1993/28] | WO1991GB01553 | Priority number, date | GB19900020030 | 13.09.1990 Original published format: GB 9020030 | GB19910006079 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9106079 | GB19910006092 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9106092 | GB19910006094 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9106094 | [1993/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205170 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550507 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/44 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
C07D213/75 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | INDOLHARNSTOFFE ALS 5HT REZEPTOR-ANTAGONIST | [1993/28] | English: | INDOLE UREAS AS 5 HT RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST | [1993/28] | French: | UREES D'INDOLE UTILISEES COMME ANTAGONISTES DE RECEPTEUR DE 5-HT | [1993/28] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 22.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/48] | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY. vol. 29, no. 11, November 1986, WASHINGTON US pages 2415 - 2418; P. FLUDZINSKI: '2,3-dialkyl(dimethylamino)indoles:Interaction with 5HT1, 5HT2 and rat stomach fundal serotin receptors.' cited in the application see the whole document SA 51152 030 |