EP0550509 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED GLYCOLIPIDS BY THE DIAPHRAGM SEPARATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHHOLZ, Rainer Fasanenstra e 35a D-1000 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Fricke, Ulrich Klosterstrasse 13 D-6251 Selters 1 / DE | 03 /
MIXICH, Johann An der Ziegelei 14 D-6233 Kelkheim / DE | [1993/33] |
Former [1993/28] | 01 /
BUCHHOLZ, Rainer Fasanenstra e 35a D-1000 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
FRICKE, Ulrich Am Flachsland 56 D-6233 Kelkheim / DE | |||
03 /
MIXICH, Johann An der Ziegelei 14 D-6233 Kelkheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91916553.0 | 14.09.1991 | [1993/28] | WO1991EP01756 | Priority number, date | DE19904030264 | 25.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4030264 | [1993/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205183 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550509 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550509 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04, B01D61/14 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,US);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
B01D61/16 (EP,US);
C07H1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG GEREINIGTER GLYCOLIPIDE DURCH MEMBRANTRENNVERFAHREN | [1993/28] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PURIFIED GLYCOLIPIDS BY THE DIAPHRAGM SEPARATION METHOD | [1993/28] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION DE GLYCOLIPIDES PURIFIES PAR UN PROCEDE DE SEPARATION A MEMBRANE | [1993/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0153634 (WINTERSHALL AG [DE]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGYBd. 47, Nr. 1, 1990, Seiten 23 - 29; C.N. MULLIGAN ET AL: 'Recovery of Biosurfactants by Ultrafiltration' in der Anmeldung erwähnt siehe den ganzen Artikel | [Y] - TENSIDE SURFACTANTS DETERGENTS Bd. 25, Nr. 4, 1988, Seiten 208 - 211; M.P. BOSCH ET AL: 'Surface Active Compounds on Microbial Cultures' siehe Seite 210, Spalte 2, Zeile 11 - Zeile 16; Tabelle 3 |