EP0498877 - Emission controlled cleaning of articles with volatile solvents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/34] | EMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR FLUID COMPOSITIONS HAVING VOLATILE CONSTITUENTS AND METHOD THEREOF | ||
[1995/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANT, David, C., H. One Walnut Lane Selbyville, DE 19975 / US | [1992/34] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | MacGregor, Gordon ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91916671.0 | 11.09.1991 | [1992/34] | WO1991US06565 | Priority number, date | US19900581020 | 12.09.1990 Original published format: US 581020 | [1992/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9204101 | Date: | 19.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498877 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498877 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D5/00 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
C23G5/04 (EP,US);
B01D53/00 (KR);
B01D5/0054 (EP,US);
B01D53/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/34] | B01D53/00, B01D53/34, B01D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/34] | Title | German: | Emissionsfreie Reinigung von Gegenständen mit flüchigen Lösungsmitteln | [1995/19] | English: | Emission controlled cleaning of articles with volatile solvents | [1995/19] | French: | Nettoyage des objets avec des liquides volatils sans fuites de liquides volatils | [1995/19] |
Former [1992/34] | EMISSIONSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT FLÜCHTIGEN KOMPONENTEN | ||
Former [1992/34] | EMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR FLUID COMPOSITIONS HAVING VOLATILE CONSTITUENTS AND METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [1992/34] | SYSTEME DE REDUCTION D'EMISSIONS POUR COMPOSITIONS DE FLUIDES COPMPORTANT DES CONSTITUANTS VOLATILS ET LEUR PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3012759 (KRUGMANN HANS GUENTHER); | [X]GB2085310 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG); | [X]DE3907437 (MAKEL LUFT & UMWELTTECHNIK GMB [DE]); | [X]EP0331611 (OTTO OEKO TECH [DE]) |