EP0556193 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING ARTICLES BETWEEN TWO CONTROLLED ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASYST TECHNOLOGIES 1745 McCanless Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [1993/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONORA, Anthony, C. 300 Felton Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
GUERRE, Gilles 7, rue de Tilleules F-78350 Les-Loges-en-Josas / FR | 03 /
PARIKH, Mihir 7174 Wooded Lake Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 04 /
ROSENQUIST, Frederick, T. 738 Canyon Road Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | 05 /
JAIN, Sudhir 4200 Bay Street, # 148 Fremont, California 94538 / US | [1993/42] |
Former [1993/39] | 01 /
BONORA, Anthony, C. 30 Felton Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
02 /
GUERRE, Gilles 7, rue de Tilleules F-78350 Les-Loges-en-Josas / FR | |||
03 /
PARIKH, Mihir 7174 Wooded Lake Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | |||
04 /
ROSENQUIST, Frederick, T. 738 Canyon Road Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | |||
05 /
JAIN, Sudhir 4200 Bay Street, # 148 Fremont, California 94538 / US | |||
Former [1993/34] | 01 /
BONORA, Anthony, C. 30 Felton Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
02 /
GUERRE, Gilles 7, rue de Tilleules F-78350 Les-Loges-en-Josas / FR | |||
03 /
PARIKH, Mihir 7174 Wooded Lake Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | |||
04 /
ROSENQUIST, Frederick, T. 738 Canyon Road Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | |||
05 /
JAIN, Sudhir 530 Mansion Court, 314 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC2A 1AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 91916767.6 | 12.09.1991 | [1993/34] | WO1991US06620 | Priority number, date | US19900607898 | 01.11.1990 Original published format: US 607898 | [1993/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207759 | Date: | 14.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556193 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0556193 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/04, H01L21/00 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
H01L21/67757 (EP,US);
G03F7/7075 (EP,US);
H01L21/67772 (EP,US);
Y10S414/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/34] | B65B1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERFÜHREN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN AUS EINER KONTROLLIERTEN ATMOSPHÄRE IN EINE ANDERE | [1993/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING ARTICLES BETWEEN TWO CONTROLLED ENVIRONMENTS | [1993/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRANSFERER DES OBJETS ENTRE DEUX MILIEUX CONTROLES | [1993/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1993 | Search fee paid | 05.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 11.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.12.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/42] | FR | 03.05.1996 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4405435 (TATEISHI HIDEKI [JP], et al); | [X]US4619572 (LORENZELLI ROBERT [FR], et al); | [X]US4797054 (ARII KATSUYUKI [JP]); | [A]US4532970 (TULLIS BARCLAY J [US], et al); | [A]US4534389 (TULLIS BARCLAY J [US]); | [A]US4707334 (GERHARD TOLASCH [DE]); | [A]US4724874 (PARIKH MIHIR [US], et al); | [A]US4781511 (HARADA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4815912 (MANEY GEORGE A [US], et al); | [AP]US4995430 (BONORA ANTHONY C [US], et al) |