EP0550536 - CONTACT PIN WITH CERAMIC INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CeramTec AG Innovative Ceramic Engineering Fabrikstrasse 23 - 29 73207 Plochingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states CeramTec AG Innovative Ceramic Engineering Fabrikstrasse 23 - 29 73207 Plochingen / DE | ||
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states Hoechst CeramTec Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelmstrasse 14 D-95100 Selb / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZYPERRECK, Hans Albertistrasse 11 D-8560 Lauf / DE | 02 /
MEILER, Fritz Rudolfshofer-Strasse 31 D-8560 Lauf / DE | 03 /
STUHLER, Helmut Bismarckstrasse 9 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1997/02] |
Former [1993/28] | Hoffmann, Peter, Dipl.-Chem. Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 91916873.2 | 25.09.1991 | [1993/28] | WO1991EP01827 | Priority number, date | DE19904030408 | 26.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4030408 | [1993/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205605 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550536 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550536 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/415, H01K1/46 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
H01R13/415 (EP,US);
H01R9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL, SE [1996/29] |
Former [1993/28] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | KONTAKTSTIFT MIT KERAMIKISOLIERUNG | [1993/28] | English: | CONTACT PIN WITH CERAMIC INSULATION | [1993/28] | French: | BROCHE DE CONTACT AVEC ISOLATION EN CERAMIQUE | [1993/28] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Request for further processing for: | 28.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3812324 (FAFFAELLI J, et al); | [X]GB2093632 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH); | [Y]DE3830188 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) |