EP0552196 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING VALVE SEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLUM, James, A., Jr. 212 Dawson Drive Seaford, VA 23696 / US | 02 /
LEHMANN, Robert 206 Fischer Drive Newport News, VA 23602 / US | 03 /
PARISH, James 712 Ninebark Court Newport News, VA 23602 / US | [1993/30] | Application number, filing date | 91917373.2 | 01.10.1991 | [1993/30] | WO1991EP01879 | Priority number, date | US19900596166 | 11.10.1990 Original published format: US 596166 | [1993/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207183 | Date: | 30.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552196 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0552196 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M61/18 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
F02M61/168 (EP,US);
F02M51/0671 (EP,US);
F02M61/18 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49423 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49799 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER VENTILDICHTUNG | [1993/30] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING VALVE SEALING | [1993/30] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A AMELIORER LE JOINT DE SOUPAPE | [1993/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 16.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0216010 (ALLIED CORP [US]); | [A]EP0219591 (VOEST ALPINE FRIEDMANN [AT]); | [A]GB2058466 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]US4275844 (GRGURICH WILLIAM A, et al); | [A]FR972143 (AVIAT ET MATERIEL MODERNE SOC); | [A]FR1553610 |