EP0552202 - Methods mediated by the proto-oncogenic protein complex AP-1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/30] | FUNCTIONAL ANTAGONISM BETWEEN PROTO-ONCOPROTEIN c-JUN AND HORMONE RECEPTORS | ||
[1996/03] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SALK INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDIES 10010 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states THE SALK INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDIES 10010 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | ||
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states THE SALK INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDIES 10010 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Ronald, M. 8615 La Jolla Scenic Road North La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
SCHULE, Roland 3965 Camino Calma San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Polz, Leo, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Polz, Leo, Dr., et al Hoffmann Eitle Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/30] | Kolb, Helga, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91917435.9 | 20.09.1991 | [1993/30] | WO1991US06848 | Priority number, date | US19900586187 | 21.09.1990 Original published format: US 586187 | [1993/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205447 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552202 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0552202 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0552202 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/74, G01N33/68, G01N33/566, G01N33/574 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US);
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/566 (EP,US);
G01N33/5748 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G01N33/6872 (EP,US);
G01N33/6875 (EP,US);
G01N33/743 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/30] | Title | German: | Durch protoonkogenischen Proteinkomplex AP-1 kontrollierte Verfahren | [1996/03] | English: | Methods mediated by the proto-oncogenic protein complex AP-1 | [1996/03] | French: | Méthodes contrôlées par le complexe protéique proto-oncogénique AP-1 | [1996/03] |
Former [1993/30] | FUNKTIONELLER ANTAGONISMUS ZWISCHEN PROTOONKOGEN-C-JUN UND HORMONREZEPTOREN | ||
Former [1993/30] | FUNCTIONAL ANTAGONISM BETWEEN PROTO-ONCOPROTEIN c-JUN AND HORMONE RECEPTORS | ||
Former [1993/30] | ANTAGONISME FONCTIONNEL ENTRE LA PROTO-ONCOPROTEINE c-JUN ET DES RECEPTEURS D'HORMONES | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
20.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Karo Bio AB Novum S141 57 Huddinge / SE Opponent's representative Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | 02
17.10.1996
12.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Astra AB S-151 85 Södertälje / SE Opponent's representative Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
20.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Karo Bio AB Novum S141 57 Huddinge / SE Opponent's representative Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
02
17.10.1996
12.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Astra AB S-151 85 Södertälje / SE Opponent's representative Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | |||
Former [1997/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
20.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Karo Bio AB Novum S141 57 Huddinge / SE Opponent's representative Dean, John Paul Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
02
17.10.1996
12.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Astra AB S-151 85 Södertälje / SE Opponent's representative Almond-Martin, Carol Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | |||
Former [1996/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1996
20.11.1996
ADMISSIBLE Karo Bio AB Novum S141 57 Huddinge / SE Opponent's representative Dean, John Paul Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | 23.12.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.09.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 25.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.10.2004 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.06.2005 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 06.06.2002 | Appeal received No. T0609/02 | 12.08.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.10.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 27.10.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.1997 | DK | 20.09.1997 | LU | 20.09.1997 | ES | 22.09.1997 | BE | 30.09.1997 | GR | 30.09.1997 | [2015/21] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 20.09.1997 | |
LU | 20.09.1997 | ||
ES | 22.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
GR | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2004/37] | AT | 20.09.1997 | |
ES | 22.09.1997 | ||
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
GR | 30.09.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2004/09] | AT | 20.09.1997 | |
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
GR | 30.09.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
ES | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 20.09.1997 | |
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
ES | 01.12.2000 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
Former [2001/28] | AT | 20.09.1997 | |
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
ES | 01.12.2000 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 20.09.1997 | |
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
LU | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 20.09.1997 | |
BE | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 20.09.1997 | Cited in | International search | [Y] - R. SCHÜLE ET AL, "Functional antagonism between oncoprotein c-Jun and the glucocorticoid receptor.", CELL, BOSTON ; MA. US., (19900921), vol. 62, pages 1217 - 1226, XP001189229 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(90)90397-W | [Y] - C. JONAT ET AL, "Antitumor promotion and antiinflammation: down-modulation of ap-1 (fos/jun) activity by glucocorticoid activity.", CELL, BOSTON, MA. US., (19900921), vol. 62, pages 1189 - 1204, XP001189230 [Y] 1-23 * page 1200, column 1, line 13 - line 24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(90)90395-U | [A] - P. SASSONE-CORSI ET AL, "Direct interaction between fos and jun nuclear oncoproteins: role of the "nuclear zipper" domain.", NATURE, LONDON , UK., (19881215), vol. 336, pages 692 - 695, XP001189231 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/336692a0 |