EP0558501 - CATALYTIC REACTOR AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING EMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PFEFFERLE, William C. 51 Woodland Drive Middletown, NJ 07748 / US | [1993/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91917635.4 | 19.09.1991 | [1993/36] | WO1991US06830 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306347 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558501 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558501 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/28 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
B01J12/007 (EP,US);
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/2026 (EP,US);
F01N3/2803 (EP,US);
F01N3/2807 (EP,US);
F01N3/2825 (EP,US);
F01N3/2835 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00783 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00822 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00824 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00835 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00873 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N2330/10 (EP,US);
F01N2330/12 (EP,US);
F01N2330/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/36] | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHER REAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR EMISSIONSBEGRENZUNG | [1993/36] | English: | CATALYTIC REACTOR AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING EMISSIONS | [1993/36] | French: | REACTEUR CATALYTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DES EMISSIONS | [1993/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1992 | Search fee paid | 18.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2134407 (FORD MOTOR CO); | [A]US4976929 (CORNELISON RICHARD C [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US3768982 (KITZNER E, et al); | [A]US3910850 (TURNER GORDON JAMES); | [A]US4350664 (GAYSERT GERHARD); | [A]US4556543 (MOCHIDA SHIGERU [JP], et al) |