EP0553166 - ANIMAL STALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREET, Michael, John 34 Cutcliffe Grove Bedford MK40 4DD / GB | 02 /
MOTTRAM, Toby, Trevor Madgeon Lane Farm Buckland St. Mary Chard Somerset TA20 3QF / GB | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Trevor-Briscoe, David William, et al Patents Department British Technology Group Limited 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Trevor-Briscoe, David William, et al Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1993/31] | Chandler, Derek Richard, et al Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91918039.8 | 18.10.1991 | [1993/31] | WO1991GB01831 | Priority number, date | GB19900022804 | 19.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9022804 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9206588 | Date: | 30.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553166 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553166 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/12, A01J7/00 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
A01K1/12 (EP,US);
A01J5/0175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | STALL FÜR TIERE | [1993/31] | English: | ANIMAL STALL | [1993/31] | French: | STALLE POUR ANIMAUX | [1993/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2605841 (DAFFINI JEAN PIERRE [FR]); | [A]EP0191517 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]); | [A]EP0188303 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]); | [A]WO9007268 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) |