EP0552239 - AUTOMATIC AIR COOKING SYSTEM FOR VENDING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORE-IDA FOODS, INC. 220 W. Park Center Blvd. Boise, ID 83707 / US | [1997/29] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states ORE-IDA FOODS, INC. 348 West Parkcenter Blvd. Boise, ID 83707 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COVINGTON, Wayne, L. 8455 Westchester Boise, ID 83704 / US | 02 /
GREEN, Glen, R. 3700 Camas Boise, ID 83705 / US | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 91918329.3 | 09.10.1991 | [1993/30] | WO1991US07225 | Priority number, date | US19900594382 | 09.10.1990 Original published format: US 594382 | [1993/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205734 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552239 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0552239 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/04 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
G07F17/0085 (EP,US);
A47J37/04 (KR);
A47J36/38 (EP,US);
A47J37/1228 (EP,US);
G07F17/0078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/30] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES HEIZLUFT-KOCHSYSTEM FÜR VERKAUFSAUTOMATEN | [1993/30] | English: | AUTOMATIC AIR COOKING SYSTEM FOR VENDING MACHINES | [1993/30] | French: | SYSTEME AUTOMATIQUE DE CUISSON A L'AIR POUR DES DISTRIBUTEURS AUTOMATIQUES | [1993/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1993 | Search fee paid | 06.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 18.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4068572 (VOGT HANS) | International search | [A]US1649488 (ROBINSON RAYMOND D, et al); | [A]US2640414 (JENSEN CHARLES B); | [A]US3643404 (RONNING RICHARD L); | [A]US3762394 (NEWCOMER J); | [A]US3943841 (HUANG MIN-NANG); | [A]US4155294 (LANGHAMMER JEROME [CA], et al); | [A]US4421018 (PRYPUTSCH GUNTER G [CA], et al); | [A]US4503760 (PRYPUTSCH GUNTER G [CA], et al); | [A]US4763572 (KUEHL LAWRENCE J [US]); | [A]US4854949 (GILES SR WILLIAM O [US], et al) |