EP0500925 - NEW STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING INDIUM PHOSPHIDE/INDIUM GALLIUM ARSENIDE PHOSPHIDE BURIED HETEROSTRUCTURE SEMICONDUCTOR LASERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GTE Laboratories Incorporated 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states GTE LABORATORIES INCORPORATED 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMSTROM, Roger, P. 20 Bayfield Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 02 /
MELAND, Edmund Six Vincent Street Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | 03 /
POWAZINIK, William 27 Libby Avenue Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91918807.8 | 12.09.1991 | [1992/36] | WO1991US06600 | Priority number, date | US19900583409 | 14.09.1990 Original published format: US 583409 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205576 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500925 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01S3/19, H01L21/306 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
H01S5/227 (EP,US);
H01L21/30612 (EP,US);
H01L21/30621 (EP,US);
H01S5/06226 (EP,US);
H01S5/2275 (EP,US);
H01S5/2277 (EP,US);
H01S5/32391 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/36] | H01L21/20, H01L21/205, H01L21/208, H01L33/00, H01S3/19 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/36] | Title | German: | NEUE STRUKTUR UND HERSTELLUNGSMETHODE FÜR IN INDIUMPHOSPHID/INDIUM-GALLIUM-ARSENID-PHOSPHID BEGRABENE HETEROSTRUKTURHALBLEITERLASER | [1992/36] | English: | NEW STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING INDIUM PHOSPHIDE/INDIUM GALLIUM ARSENIDE PHOSPHIDE BURIED HETEROSTRUCTURE SEMICONDUCTOR LASERS | [1992/36] | French: | NOUVELLE STRUCTURE ET NOUVEAU PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER DES LASERS A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS DONT L'HETEROSTRUCTURE EST NOYEE DANS DU PHOSPHURE D'INDIUM/PHOSPURE D'ARSENIURE IMDIUM GALLIUM | [1992/36] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.1992 | Search fee paid | 27.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 13.05.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 24, no. 24, 24 November 1988, ENAGE GB pages 1483 - 1484 T. TANBUN-EK ET AL. 'High frequency buried heterostructure 1.5 um GaInAsP/InP lasersgrown entirely by metalorganic vapour phase epitaxy in two epitaxial growth steps' | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDIUM PHOSPHIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS, Cardiff, UK, 8-11 April 1991, IEEE, New York, USApages 130-133; R.P. HOLMSTROM et al.: "New fabrication method for high frequency InP/InGaAsP buried heterostructure semiconductor lasers." | International search | [A]US4264381 (THOMPSON GEORGE H B, et al); | [A]US4496403 (TURLEY STEPHEN E H [GB]); | [A]US4644551 (KAWANO HIDOE [JP], et al); | [A]US4662988 (RENNER DANIEL S O [GB]); | [A]US4764246 (BRIDGES THOMAS J [US], et al); | [Y]US4815083 (SUGOU SHIGEO [JP], et al); | [A]US4818722 (HEINEN JOCHEN [DE]); | [A]US4830986 (PLUMB RICHARD G S [GB]); | [P]US4972238 (TANAKA AKIRA [JP]); | [P]US4987576 (HEINEN JOCHEN [DE]); | [P]US4990465 (LIAU ZONG-LONG [US], et al); | [P]US5045499 (NISHIZAWA HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [A]JPS56111284 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS5743428 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS5992591 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | JPS59130492 [ ] (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS59155977 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS59227177 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS60251689 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPS6167980 (ANRITSU CORP); | [A]JPH01114092 (HITACHI LTD) |