EP0555322 - IMPROVED HEAT EXCHANGE EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUTER ENVIRONMENTAL LTD. Newgate Lane Fareham, Hants. PO14 1AR / GB | For all designated states H.& M. DISINFECTION SYSTEMS LIMITED 2 Dalby Court, Gadbrook Business Centre, Gadbrook Road Northwich Cheshire CW9 7TN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | For all designated states SUTER ENVIRONMENTAL LTD. Newgate Lane Fareham, Hants. PO14 1AR / GB | ||
For all designated states H.& M. DISINFECTION SYSTEMS LIMITED 2 Dalby Court, Gadbrook Business Centre, Gadbrook Road Northwich, Cheshire CW9 7TN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLAN, John, David 76 Orchard Grove Portchester Hampshire PO16 9DX / GB | 02 /
HALL, Stephen, John 30 Mere Bank Davenham Northwich Cheshire CW9 8NL / GB | [1993/33] | Representative(s) | Newby, John Ross JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Newby, John Ross J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91919680.8 | 07.11.1991 | [1993/33] | WO1991GB01959 | Priority number, date | GB19900024315 | 08.11.1990 Original published format: GB 9024315 | [1993/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9208943 | Date: | 29.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555322 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F28G9/00 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
F28G9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/33] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE WÄRMETAUSCHERAUSSTATTUNG | [1993/33] | English: | IMPROVED HEAT EXCHANGE EQUIPMENT | [1993/33] | French: | INSTALLATION D'ECHANGE THERMIQUE AMELIOREE | [1993/33] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/12] | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4274845 ; | [Y]US4858632 ; | [X]DE3120376 ; | [Y]DE2810526 ; | [X]US4666531 ; | [A]US4186727 ; | [A]US3827343 | [Y] - DUFFAU ET AL 'L'ENCRASSEMENT DANS LES ECHANGEURS' April 1985 , GRETH , GRENOBLE FR see page 40, paragraph II42 see page 85, paragraph C |