EP0558546 - CONTAINER SUPPLY CAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISDOM AGRICULTURAL INVESTMENTS LIMITED 39 Scotch Firs Fownhope Hereford HR1 4NP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states WISDOM AGRICULTURAL INVESTMENTS LIMITED 39 Scotch Firs Fownhope, Hereford HR1 4NP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARNETT, Richard, Henry Wisdom Agricultural Ltd. Opella Building Twyford Road Rotherwas Industrial Estate Hereford HR2 6JR / GB | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al A. R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al A. R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91919972.9 | 19.11.1991 | [1993/36] | WO1991GB02043 | Priority number, date | GB19900025265 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: GB 9025265 | [1993/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9208548 | Date: | 29.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558546 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558546 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/02, B05B7/30, A01M7/00 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
B67D7/0294 (EP);
A01M7/0092 (EP);
B05B7/30 (EP);
B67B7/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/36] | B05B7/30, A01M7/00, B67D5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/36] | Title | German: | VERSORGUNGSKAPPEN FÜR BEHÄLTER | [1993/36] | English: | CONTAINER SUPPLY CAPS | [1993/36] | French: | BOUCHONS DISTRIBUTEURS DESTINES A DES RECIPIENTS | [1993/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1994 | 30.11.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1994 | 30.11.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.1997 | BE | 27.08.1997 | CH | 27.08.1997 | DK | 27.08.1997 | ES | 27.08.1997 | FR | 27.08.1997 | GR | 27.08.1997 | IT | 27.08.1997 | LI | 27.08.1997 | NL | 27.08.1997 | LU | 19.11.1997 | SE | 27.11.1997 | DE | 28.11.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
CH | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
ES | 27.08.1997 | ||
GR | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
LI | 27.08.1997 | ||
NL | 27.08.1997 | ||
LU | 19.11.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
CH | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
ES | 27.08.1997 | ||
GR | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
LI | 27.08.1997 | ||
NL | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
CH | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
ES | 27.08.1997 | ||
GR | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
LI | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
CH | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
GR | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
LI | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
GR | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
CH | 02.12.1997 | ||
LI | 02.12.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
GR | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
DK | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
BE | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 27.08.1997 | |
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
DE | 28.11.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2628850 (SUMMERVILLE DONALD V); | [A]US3211178 (WALTER KISZKO); | [A]US4023718 (FORBRIGER ARTHUR W, et al); | [A]WO8911219 (WISDOM AGRICULTURAL LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0389191 (LAMBRECHTS NV [BE]) |