EP0570375 - NOVEL PEPTIDES WITH ANTICOAGULATORY EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIED, Bernhard Taunusstrasse 20 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
HOEFFKEN, Hans, Wolfgang Dammstueckerweg 101 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
HORNBERGER, Wilfried Mundenheimer Strasse 152 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
BERNARD, Harald Valentin Ostertag-Strasse 2 D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | [1995/16] |
Former [1993/47] | 01 /
SCHMIED, Bernhard Taunusstrasse 20 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | ||
02 /
HOEFFKEN, Hans, Wolfgang Dammstueckerweg 101 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
HORNBERGER, Wilfried Mundenheimer Strasse 152 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
04 /
BERNARD, Harald Valentin-Ostertag-Strasse 2 D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91920137.6 | 21.11.1991 | [1993/47] | WO1991EP02191 | Priority number, date | DE19914103649 | 07.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4103649 | [1993/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9213879 | Date: | 20.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570375 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570375 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K38/55 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/815 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/47] | C07K7/06, // A61K37/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/47] | Title | German: | NEUE ANTIKOAGULATORISCH WIRKSAME PEPTIDE | [1993/47] | English: | NOVEL PEPTIDES WITH ANTICOAGULATORY EFFECT | [1993/47] | French: | NOUVEAUX PEPTIDES A ACTIVITE ANTICOAGULANTE | [1993/47] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9003391 (BIOGEN INC [US]); | [A]EP0372670 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO9101328 (BIOGEN INC [US]); | [AP]EP0443598 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0443429 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) |