EP0512090 - TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonoran Desert Chemicals LLC 4250 N. Drinkwater Blvd., 4th floor Scottsdale, Arizona 85251 / US | [2003/22] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states Lezdey, John 976 Kingston Drive Cherry Hill, New Jersey 08034 / US | ||
For all designated states Wachter, Allan 9822 South Grandview Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lezdey, John 976 Kingston Drive Cherry Hill, New Jersey 08034 / US | 02 /
Wachter, Allan M. 9822 South Grandview Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | [2003/22] |
Former [1992/46] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1992/46] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 91920172.3 | 26.09.1991 | [1992/46] | WO1991US06847 | Priority number, date | US19900598241 | 16.10.1990 Original published format: US 598241 | US19910643727 | 18.01.1991 Original published format: US 643727 | US19910683620 | 11.04.1991 Original published format: US 683620 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9206706 | Date: | 30.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512090 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512090 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0512090 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/55, A61K31/56 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP);
A61K38/57 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/55, A61K31/57 (EP);
A61K38/57, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [1992/46] | A61K37/64, A61K31/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGEN | [1992/46] | English: | TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION | [1992/46] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'INFLAMMATIONS | [1992/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1992 | Search fee paid | 09.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 17.05.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.04.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 17.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.1996 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE ZLB Behring GmbH Postfach 1230 35002 Marburg / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich ZLB Behring GmbH Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | 02
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Genzyme Transgenics Corporation Five Mountain Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US Opponent's representative Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | 03
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE ZLB Behring GmbH Postfach 1230 35002 Marburg / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich, Dr. ZLB Behring GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | ||
02
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Genzyme Transgenics Corporation Five Mountain Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US Opponent's representative Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | |||
03
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
Former [2005/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE ZLB Behring GmbH Postfach 1230 35002 Marburg / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich, Dr. ZLB Behring GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | ||
02
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Genzyme Transgenics Corporation Five Mountain Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US Opponent's representative Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, CB2 1LA / GB | |||
03
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
Former [2005/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE AVENTIS BEHRING GMBH Postfach 1230 35002 MARBURG / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich, Dr. Aventis Behring GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | ||
02
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Genzyme Transgenics Corporation Five Mountain Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US Opponent's representative Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, CB2 1LA / GB | |||
03
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
Former [2001/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE AVENTIS BEHRING GMBH Postfach 1230 35002 MARBURG / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich, Dr. Aventis Behring GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | ||
02
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Genzyme Transgenics Corporation Five Mountain Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US Opponent's representative Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | |||
03
02.10.1997
08.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
Former [1997/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.1997
CENTEON PHARMA GMBH Postfach 1230 35002 MARBURG / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich Aventis Behring GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | ||
02
02.10.1997
Genzyme Transgenics Corporation Five Mountain Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US Opponent's representative Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | |||
03
02.10.1997
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
Former [1997/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.1997
CENTEON PHARMA GMBH Postfach 1230 35002 MARBURG / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich Aventis Behring GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | ||
02
02.10.1997
ADMISSIBLE Genzyme Transgenics Corporation Five Mountain Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US Opponent's representative Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | |||
Former [1997/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.09.1997
CENTEON PHARMA GMBH Postfach 1230 35002 MARBURG / DE Opponent's representative Lauppe, Hans Friedrich Aventis Behring GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | 11.12.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.06.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.05.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.10.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.07.2001 | Appeal received No. T0676/01 | 07.09.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.05.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 15.06.2001 | Appeal received No. T0676/01 | 07.09.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.06.2002 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2002/23] | 26.07.2002 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2002/30] | 19.12.2002 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2002/51] | 18.02.2003 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2003/08] | 09.05.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.2005 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.1992 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 | 21.08.1992 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.09.2006 | LU | 26.09.2006 | SE | 27.09.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | DK | 02.10.2006 | FR | 02.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | [2013/51] |
Former [2010/05] | GB | 26.09.2006 | |
LU | 26.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.10.2006 | ||
FR | 02.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | GB | 26.09.2006 | |
LU | 26.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.10.2006 | ||
FR | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/23] | GB | 26.09.2006 | |
SE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.10.2006 | ||
FR | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/02] | GB | 26.09.2006 | |
SE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | SE | 27.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0139383 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]); | [X]US4916117 (LEZDEY JOHN [US], et al); | [XP]EP0432117 (LEZDEY JOHN [US], et al) | [Y] - BIOL. CHEM. HOPPE-SEYLER, VOL. 371, SUPPL. May 1990, BERLIN, FRG pages 75 - 79 S.C. DIETZE ET AL. 'Inhibition of Histamine Release from Human Mast Cells Ex Vivo by Natural and Synthetic Chymase Inhibitors' | [Y] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. (MICROFILMS) vol. 264, no. 35, 15 December 1989, BALTIMORE, MD US pages 21308 - 21315 N.M. SCHECHTER ET AL. 'Reaction of Human Skin Chymotrypsin-like Proteinase Chymase with Plasma Proteinase Inhibitors' | International search | [X] - Biochemical Medicine and Metabolic Biology, Volume 38, issued 1987, FUKUSEN et al., "Kinetic Studies on the Inhibitions of Mast Cell Chymase by Natureal Serine Protease Inhibitiors: Indications for Potential Biological Functions of these Inhibitors", pp 165-169, see entire documents. | [Y] - J Clin, Invest., Vol. 71, issued June 1983, Schleimer et al., "Effects of Dexamethasone on Mediator Release from Human Lung Fragments and Purified Human Lung Mast Cells", pp 1830-1835, see entire document. | [Y] - Am. Rev. Respir. Dis, Vol. 135, suppl., issued 1987, WASSERMAN, "The Regulation of Inflammatory mediator Production by Mast Cell Products", pp S46-S48, see entire document. | [Y] - Clinical Immunology and Immunopathology, Vol. 50, suppl., issued 1989, MARONE et al., "Pathophysiology of Human Basophils and Mast Cells in Allergic Disorders", pp. S24-S40, see entire document. | [Y] - Annals of Allergy, Vol. 63, No. 6, Suppl., issued 1989, WASSERMAN, "Mast Cell-mediated inflammation in Asthma", pp. S46-S50, see entire document. | [Y] - Ann. Rev. Immunol., Vol. 1, issued 1983, LARSEN et al., "Mediators of Inflammation", pp 335-359, see entire document. | Examination | EP0139383 | EP0432117 | Opposition | EP0289336 | EP0304971 | US5093316 | - Annals of Internal Medicine 1989, 111(3), pp. 206-212 |