EP0505560 - STABILIZATION OF CHLOROFLUOROCARBON COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLUGA, Robert, M. 4964 Carriage Drive Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 02 /
WATKINS, Randolph, H. 5119 E. Lake Shore Drive Wonder Lake, IL 60097 / US | 03 /
GAJEWSKI, Henry, M. 187 Forest Drive Winnetka, IL 60093 / US | 04 /
FISHER, Jerry, D. 4724 Cumberland Circle McHenry, IL 60050 / US | 05 /
BERRY, Dennis, C. 209 S. Shannon Drive Woodstock, IL 60098 / US | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91920394.3 | 10.10.1991 | [1992/40] | WO1991US07484 | Priority number, date | US19900596880 | 12.10.1990 Original published format: US 596880 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207059 | Date: | 30.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505560 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505560 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/50 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
C11D7/261 (EP,US);
C11D7/5018 (EP,US);
C11D7/5081 (EP,US);
C11D7/266 (EP,US);
C11D7/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNG VON FLUORCHLORKOHLENWASSERSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1992/40] | English: | STABILIZATION OF CHLOROFLUOROCARBON COMPOSITIONS | [1992/40] | French: | STABILISATION DE COMPOSITIONS DE CHLOROFLUOROCARBONE | [1992/40] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 04.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3723332 (BARTON O); | [A]GB1377156 (ISC CHEMICALS LTD); | [Y]GB2014601 (ICI LTD); | [A]DE3132720 (SIGDELL JAN ERIK DR); | [XP]WO9114020 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) |