EP0509083 - RED BLOOD CELL STORAGE SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAYRAT, Jean-Marc Allée du Long-Petu B-61400 Nivelles / BE | 02 /
HOGMAN, Claes, F. Statarvagen 14 S-756 45 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
DEBRAUWERE, Jack Debusscherstraat 38 B-1500 Halle / BE | 04 /
MATHIAS, Jean-Marie 46, avenue du Tonnelier B-1418 Lillois / BE | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91920424.8 | 30.10.1991 | [1992/43] | WO1991US08115 | Priority number, date | US19900610478 | 07.11.1990 Original published format: US 610478 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9208348 | Date: | 29.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509083 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0509083 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.05.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A01N1/0226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/43] | A01N1/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/43] | Title | German: | LÖSUNG ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG ROTER BLUTZELLEN | [1992/43] | English: | RED BLOOD CELL STORAGE SOLUTION | [1992/43] | French: | SOLUTION DE STOCKAGE DE GLOBULES ROUGES DE SANG | [1992/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.1992 | Search fee paid | 06.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01106826 ; | [X]EP0301250 (BIOTEST PHARMA GMBH [DE]); | [X]DD152719 (KLINKE BIRGIT, et al); | [X]WO8600809 (AMERICAN NAT RED CROSS [US]); | [A]EP0313808 (AMERICAN NAT RED CROSS [US]); | [A]US4267269 (GRODE GERALD A, et al); | [A]EP0099315 (CENTRE REGIONAL DE TRANSFUSION [FR]) | [A] - MEZEY ET AL, "Study and use of the acd-adenine-guanosine blood stabiliser", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1978), vol. 89, no. 19, Database accession no. 160846W | [ ] - ACTA PHARM. HUNG, vol. 48, no. 4, pages 145 - 150 | [A] - MESSETER ET AL, "Cpd-adenine as a blood preservative-studies in vitro and in vivo", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1977), vol. 87, no. 13, Database accession no. 99582X | [ ] - TRANSFUSION, vol. 17, no. 3, pages 210 - 217 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 22, Database accession no. 1989-192877, & JPH01106826 A 19890424 (KAO CORP) | [A] - STRAUSS ET AL, "Sag-sucrose medium for red blood cell preservation", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1987), vol. 106, no. 17, Database accession no. 136009Z | [ ] - BIOMED BIOCHIM. ACTA, vol. 46, no. 2-3, pages 295 - 299 | International search | [Y]US4572899 (WALKER WOLFRAM H [DE], et al); | [Y]US3874384 (DEINDOERFER FRED H, et al) | [X] - Vox Sanguinis, Volume 49, issued 1985, J.A.F. NAPIER et al., "What is the "Optmum" Optimal additive solution?", pages 315-318, see table 1. | [Y] - Transfusion, Volume 26, No. 6, issued 1986, H.T. MERYMAN et al., "Prolonged Storage of Red Cells at 4°C", pages 500-505, see table 1. | Examination | - TRANSFUSION, vol. 26, no. 6, 1986; H.T. MERYMAN et al., pp. 500-505 |