EP0516860 - CHROMONE DERIVATIVE AND ALDOSE REDUCTASE INHIBITOR CONTAINING THE SAME AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUMURA & CO. 4-10, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states TSUMURA & CO. 4-10, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGARASHI, Yasushi Tsumura & Co. 3586, Yoshiwara Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-11 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Takuji Tsumura & Co. 3586, Yoshiwara Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-11 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Yoshimitsu Tsumura & Co. 3586, Yoshiwara Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-11 / JP | 04 /
TOMITA, Mika Tsumura & Co. 3586, Yoshiwara Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-11 / JP | 05 /
HAYASHI, Hiroko Tsumura & Co. 3586, Yoshiwara Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-11 / JP | 06 /
SATO, Toshitsugu Tsumura & Co. 3586, Yoshiwara Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-11 / JP | 07 /
HOSAKA, Kunio Tsumura & Co. 3586, Yoshiwara Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki 300-11 / JP | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1995/31] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1992/50] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91920820.7 | 29.11.1991 | [1992/50] | WO1991JP01672 | Priority number, date | JP19900330519 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: JP 33051990 | JP19900330520 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: JP 33052090 | [1992/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9209594 | Date: | 11.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516860 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/54, A61K31/35 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D311/54 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/50] | C07D311/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/50] | Title | German: | INHIBITOR DER ALDOSE REDUKTASE MIT EINEM CHROMONDERIVAT ALS AKTIVER BESTANDTEIL | [1992/50] | English: | CHROMONE DERIVATIVE AND ALDOSE REDUCTASE INHIBITOR CONTAINING THE SAME AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [1992/50] | French: | DERIVE DE BENZOPYRONE ET INHIBITEUR DE REDUCTASE D'ALDOSE CONTENANT CE DERIVE EN TANT QU'INGREDIENT ACTIF | [1992/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1992 | Translation filed | 28.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1992 | Search fee paid | 28.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/52] | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP02169586 ; | [Y]JP5899414 ; | [Y]JP63104920 ; | [Y]US4532254 (OKUDA JUN [JP], et al) | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 435 (C-760)18 September 1990 & JP-A-02 169 586 ( TSUMURA ) 29 June 1990, & JP02169586 A 19900629 | [XD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 9, 28 February 1977, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 55239r, T. KOMIYA et al.: 'Studies on "Inchinko." II. Studies on the compounds related to capillarisin and flavonoids' page 420 ; | [XD] - JOURNAL OF THE PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN vol. 96, no. 7, 1976, pages 841 - 862 T. KOMIYA ET AL. 'STUDIES ON "INCHINKO". I. AND II.' | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 90199j, 'ALDOSE REDUCTASE INHIBITORS OF INCHINKO' page 60 ;column 1 ; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 201 (C-184)(1346) 6 September 1983 & JP-A-58 99 414 ( JIYUN OKUDA ) 13 June 1983, & JP5899414 A 19830613 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 349 (C-529)(3196) 20 September 1988 & JP-A-63 104 920 ( TSUMURA JUNTENDO INC ) 10 May 1988, & JP63104920 A 19880510 | [Y] - BIOPHYSICAL CHEMISTRY vol. 8, no. 1, 1978, pages 81 - 85 P.F. KADOR ET AL. 'STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY STUDIES OF ALDOSE REDUCTASE INHIBITORS CONTAINING THE 4-OXO-4H-CHROMEN RING SYSTEM' | [Y] - THERAPEUTIQUE vol. 38, no. 6, 1983, pages 659 - 663 A. LAURENS ET AL. 'LES INHIBITEURS DE L¡ALDOSE REDUCTASE' | International search | [X]JPS5639085 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [X]JPH01228914 (TSUMURA & CO) |