EP0555364 - CONVERTIBLE GUIDEWIRE-CATHETER WITH SOFT TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION One Boston Scientific Place Natick MA 01760 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Corporation One Boston Scientific Place Natick, Massachusetts 01760 / US | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Corporation One Boston Scientific Place Natic, Massachusetts 01760 / US | ||
Former [1993/33] | For all designated states BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION 480 Pleasant Street Watertown, MA 02172-2407 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ de TOLEDO, Fernando 229 Fairhaven Hill Concord, MA 01742 / US | [1993/33] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91920855.3 | 28.10.1991 | [1993/33] | WO1991US08287 | Priority number, date | US19900605561 | 29.10.1990 Original published format: US 605561 | [1993/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207507 | Date: | 14.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555364 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0555364 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61M25/00 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
A61M25/0053 (EP,US);
A61M25/0054 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0063 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0081 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09083 (EP,US);
A61M25/005 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/33] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/33] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSDRAHT ODER KATHETER MIT NACHGIEBIGER SPITZE | [1993/33] | English: | CONVERTIBLE GUIDEWIRE-CATHETER WITH SOFT TIP | [1993/33] | French: | FIL TRANSFORMABLE EN FIL DE GUIDAGE-CATHETER A EXTREMITE SOUPLE | [1993/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.1993 | Search fee paid | 01.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 01.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 06.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.11.1994 | 04   M02   Fee paid on   05.12.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.08.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 21.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4516972 (SAMSON WILFRED J [US]) | International search | [Y]US4955862 (SEPETKA IVAN [US]); | [YP]US4981478 (EVARD PHILIP C [US], et al); | [Y]US4906241 (NODDIN RICHARD A [US], et al); | [Y]US4723936 (BUCHBINDER MAURICE [US], et al); | [A]US4846186 (BOX JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]US4739768 (ENGELSON ERIK T [US]) | [Y] - Radiology, Vol. 154, March 1985, THOMAS A. SOS et al., "A New Open-ended Guidewire/Catheter" pages 817 and 818 (see entire reference). |