EP0552307 - TEMPORARY STENT AND METHODS FOR USE AND MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scimed Life Systems, Inc. 6655 Wedgwood Road Maple Grove, MN 55369-7503 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS, INC. 6655 Wedgwood Road Maple Grove, MN 55369-7503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLARD, Lloyd Rt. 2, Box 5B Miltona, MN 56354 / US | 02 /
SCHMALTZ, Dale, F. 1817 Ford Parkway 205 St. Paul, MN 55116 / US | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91920909.8 | 09.10.1991 | [1993/30] | WO1991US07570 | Priority number, date | US19900594121 | 09.10.1990 Original published format: US 594121 | [1993/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9205829 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552307 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00, A61F2/06 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
A61M29/02 (EP,US);
A61F2/88 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30672 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/30] | A61M29/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/30] | Title | German: | TEMPORÄRER DILATATOR SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM GEBRAUCH UND ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1993/30] | English: | TEMPORARY STENT AND METHODS FOR USE AND MANUFACTURE | [1993/30] | French: | EXTENSEUR TEMPORAIRE ET SES PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ET DE FABRICATION | [1993/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1993 | Search fee paid | 29.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 18.08.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3320957 (EDWARD SOKOLIK); | [A]WO8704935 (FISCHELL ROBERT, et al); | [A]EP0380668 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) | International search | [Y]US4871357 (HSU LI-CHIEN [US], et al); | [XP]US4998539 (DELSANTI GERARD L [FR]); | [XP]US5002560 (MACHOLD TIMOTHY R [US], et al) |