EP0494676 - Raster image processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyama, Noritaka, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-2, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Oyake, Ikuo, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-2, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Moriya, Nobuyuki, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-2, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92100293.7 | 09.01.1992 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | JP19910012745 | 09.01.1991 Original published format: JP 1274591 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494676 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0494676 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
G06F40/109 (EP);
G06K15/02 (EP);
G06K2215/0022 (EP);
G06K2215/0025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/29] | Title | German: | Rasterbildverarbeitungssystem | [1992/29] | English: | Raster image processing system | [1992/29] | French: | Système de traitement d'image tramée | [1992/29] | File destroyed: | 04.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/12] | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.08.1994 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4811242 (ADACHI SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0121126 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3,7 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 12 * * page 1, line 20 - line 32 *; | [A]JPH02164568 ; | [A]EP0119395 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 27, paragraph 2 * * page 28, paragraph L - page 29, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP0220443 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 13 * * column 15, line 1 - column 16, line 5 * | [PX] - H-P WIEDLING ET AL, "EuroRip - A European Development of Raster Image Processor for Page Description Languages with Common Font Resources", EUROGRAPHICS '91. PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN COMPUTER GRAPHICS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, GRAPHICS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT IN EUROPEAN COMMUNITY PROGRAMMES, VIENNA, AUSTRIA, (199109), pages 115 - 127, XP000235911 [PX] 1-3,7 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (199009), vol. 14, no. 420, Database accession no. (M - 1023)<4363> , & JP02164568 A 00000000 (NEC) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |