EP0497134 - Gate leaf with aerating openings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hörmann KG Brockhagen Horststrasse 17 33803 Steinhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states Hörmann KG Brockhagen Horststrasse 17 D-33803 Steinhagen-Brockhagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörmann, Thomas J., Dipl.-Ing. Am Schlaufenglan 33 W-6690 St. Wendel / DE | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Flügel, Otto Flügel Preissner Kastel, Postfach 81 05 06 81905 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Lesser & Flügel, Postfach 81 05 06 D-81905 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92100497.4 | 14.01.1992 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | DE19914101013 | 15.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4101013 | [1992/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497134 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497134 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/02 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
E06B7/2316 (EP);
E06B7/02 (EP);
E06B9/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Torblatt mit Belüftungsöffnungen | [1992/32] | English: | Gate leaf with aerating openings | [1992/32] | French: | Feuille de portail avec ouvertures d'aération | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 16.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH429103 (HOFETO MASCHINEN UND STAHLBAU [DE], et al); | [AD]DE8601985U |