EP0495468 - Method of producing treated copper foil, products thereof and electrolyte useful in such method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIRCUIT FOIL U.S.A. INCORPORATED 88 Route 130 Bordentown New Jersey 08505-2297 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states CIRCUIT FOIL U.S.A. INCORPORATED 88 Route 130 Bordentown, New Jersey 08505-2297 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolski, Adam M. 4B-7 Arbor Green Edgewater Park, NJ 08010 / US | 02 /
Maquet, Laurette M. Rue De Warken Nr. 164 Residence Le Moulin, Luxembourg / LU | 03 /
Streel, Michel 2, Bonnerue B-6663 Mabompre / BE | [1997/13] |
Former [1992/30] | 01 /
Wolski, Adam M. 4B-7 Arbor Green Edgewater Park, New Jersey 08010 / US | ||
02 /
Maquet, Laurette M. Rue De Warken Nr. 164 Residence Le Moulin, Luxembourg / LU | |||
03 /
Streel, Michel 2, Bonnerue B-6663 Mabompre / BE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92100538.5 | 14.01.1992 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | US19910641922 | 16.01.1991 Original published format: US 641922 | [1992/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0495468 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0495468 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495468 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/58, C25D5/10 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
H05K3/384 (EP,US);
C25D3/58 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0307 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, LU [1992/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung behandelter Kupfer-Folien, daraus hergestellte Produkte sowie Elektrolyt zur Verwendung in einem solchen Verfahren | [1992/30] | English: | Method of producing treated copper foil, products thereof and electrolyte useful in such method | [1992/30] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une feuille de cuivre traitée, produits obtenus et électrolyte utilisé dans un tel procédé | [1992/30] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4356067 (MCCOY EWALD H) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 53 - line 56 * * column 7, line 45 - line 60 *; | [DA]US4572768 (WOLSKI ADAM M [US], et al) [DA] * column A; example -; claim - * | [A] - SHAPNIK ET AL., "Copper-antimony alloy electroplating in a cyanide-free bath", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19830725), vol. 99, no. 4, Database accession no. 29942p, page 463 [A] 11 * abstract * |