EP0497194 - Method for actuating an exhaust valve tappet during braking of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/32] | Outlet valve tappet for an internal combustion engine | ||
[1995/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubis, Heribert, Dipl.-Ing. Heisterstrasse 37 W-8500 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Wittmann, Dieter Bregenzerstrasse 1 W-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1992/32] | Application number, filing date | 92100960.1 | 22.01.1992 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | DE19914102537 | 29.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4102537 | [1992/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497194 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497194 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/06, F01L1/24 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
F01L13/06 (EP,US);
F01L1/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betätigen eines Auslassventilstössels im Bremsbetrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1995/14] | English: | Method for actuating an exhaust valve tappet during braking of an internal combustion engine | [1995/14] | French: | Procédé pour actionner un poussoir de soupape d'échappement d'un moteur en mode frein moteur | [1995/14] |
Former [1992/32] | Auslass-Ventilstössel für eine Brennkraftmaschine | ||
Former [1992/32] | Outlet valve tappet for an internal combustion engine | ||
Former [1992/32] | Poussoir de soupape d'échappement pour moteur à combustion interne | Examination procedure | 20.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2006373 (RICARDO & CO ENG 1927 LTD); | [Y]US4164917 (GLASSON RICHARD E); | [Y]FR2584773 (PEUGEOT [FR]) |