EP0496371 - Erectable insert for folding boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1993 | Change - withdrawal | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Heinz-Jürgen Ostendstrasse 70 W-6102 Pfungstadt / DE | 02 /
Loos, Hans-Joachim An der Schleuse 5 W-6095 Ginsheim-Gustavsburg / DE | 03 /
Ziegert, Günter Loreleistrasse 34 W-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | [1992/31] | Application number, filing date | 92100998.1 | 22.01.1992 | [1992/31] | Priority number, date | DE19910000796U | 24.01.1991 Original published format: DE 9100796 U | [1992/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0496371 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
B65D5/504 (EP);
B65D2401/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/31] | Title | German: | Aufrichtbarer Formeinsatz für Faltschachteln | [1992/31] | English: | Erectable insert for folding boxes | [1992/31] | French: | Garniture érigible pour boîtes pliantes | [1992/31] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0028995 (COFREC SA [FR]); | [X]FR2431972 (NUYTS FRERES); | [X]FR1291675 (ETS NUYTS FRERES); | [X]FR1478568 ; | [X]FR2643884 (LINCRUSTA [FR]); | [X]US2426899 (PANTALONE VINCENT R) |