EP0497232 - Railway track machine for the controlled lowering of a track [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Plasser Bahnbaumaschinen-Industriegesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states Franz Plasser Bahnbaumaschinen- Industriegesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theurer, Josef, Ing. Johannesgasse 3 A-1010 Wien / AT | 02 /
Lichtberger, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Im Bäckerfeld 15 A-4060 Leonding / AT | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92101216.7 | 25.01.1992 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | AT19910000218 | 01.02.1991 Original published format: AT 21891 | [1992/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0497232 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0497232 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497232 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E01B27/12, E01B27/20 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
E01B27/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/32] | E01B27/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Gleisbaumaschine zum kontrollierten Absenken eines Gleises | [1992/32] | English: | Railway track machine for the controlled lowering of a track | [1992/32] | French: | Engin de pose pour l'abaissement contrôlé d'une voie | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2330102 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ); | [A]DE3007949 (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES); | [A]DE3409851 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]); | [AD]US4953467 (THEURER JOSEF [AT]) |