EP0498344 - Magnetoresistance effect element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Shimogamo Morimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-to 103 / JP | For all designated states JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Shimogamo Morimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | |||
For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | |||
For all designated states JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Shimogamo Morimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | |||
For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | |||
For all designated states JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Shimogamo Morimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | |||
For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | |||
For all designated states JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEISAN KAIHATSU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO 15, Shimogamo Morimoto-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 606 / JP | |||
For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | |||
For all designated states NIPPON MINING COMPANY LIMITED 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakakima, Hiroshi 3-20-19, Kasumizaka, Tanabecho Tsuzuki-gun, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Satomi, Mitsuo 52-4, Kisabe-6-chome Katano-shi / JP | 03 /
Takada, Toshio 1, Kitashirakawa Nishisenouchicho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Shinjo, Teruya 39-1055, Okurayama Kowata, Uji-shi / JP | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/33] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92101727.3 | 03.02.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | JP19910013620 | 04.02.1991 Original published format: JP 1362091 | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498344 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498344 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0498344 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/16, G01R33/06, H01F10/08 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
G01D5/142 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/093 (EP,US);
G11B5/3903 (EP,US);
H01F10/32 (EP,US);
H01F10/3281 (EP,US);
H10N50/85 (EP,US);
G11B2005/3996 (EP,US);
Y10S428/926 (EP,US);
Y10S428/928 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12465 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/33] | Title | German: | Magnetoresistives Element | [1992/33] | English: | Magnetoresistance effect element | [1992/33] | French: | Elément magnéto-résistif | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.1996
16.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.1996
16.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 21.06.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.07.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.01.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.06.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.07.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.04.1999 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH472761 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0304280 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0406060 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |