EP0498425 - Glass fiber forming composition, glass fibers obtained from the composition and substrate for circuit board including the glass fibers as reinforcing material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS COMPANY., LTD. 7-1 Seiran 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 7-1 Seiran 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komori, Kiyotaka 6-10-405, Shinbashi-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Yamakawa, Seishiro 2-32-7, Kazuhanoda Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Sigeru, 397, Shininokuma-cho Teranouchidori-Senbonhigashiiru Kamigyo-ku, Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Naka, Jun 1-24, Yamakakenoue-cho, Yamashina-ku Kamigyo-ku, Kyoto / JP | 05 /
Kokubo, Tadashi 2-50, Umegaoka Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92101994.9 | 06.02.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | JP19910017747 | 08.02.1991 Original published format: JP 1774791 | JP19910142163 | 13.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14216391 | JP19910143465 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14346591 | JP19910145901 | 18.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14590191 | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498425 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498425 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C03C13/00, H05K1/03 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
C03C3/097 (EP,US);
C03C13/00 (EP,US);
C03C3/091 (EP,US);
C03C3/102 (EP,US);
H05K1/0326 (EP,US);
H05K1/0366 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/33] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Erzeugung von Glasfasern, damit hergestellte Glasfasern und Substrat für Leiterplatte mit den Glasfasern als Verstärkungsmaterial | [1992/33] | English: | Glass fiber forming composition, glass fibers obtained from the composition and substrate for circuit board including the glass fibers as reinforcing material | [1992/33] | French: | Composition pour former des fibres de verre, fibres de verre obtenues avec cette composition, et substrat pour plaque de circuit comportant ces fibres de verre comme matériau de renforcement | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 20.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP01179741 ; | [A]JP2050834 ; | [X]US3060041 (LEOPOLD LOEWENSTEIN KLAUS); | [Y]GB2172892 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]FR1561647 ; | [A]EP0013379 (ROGERS CORP [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 461 (C-645)18 October 1989 & JP-A-01 179 741 ( ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD. ) 17 July 1989, & JP01179741 A 19890717 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 03, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 90-096954 & JP-A-2 050 834 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRICAL WORKS) 20 February 1990, & JP2050834 A 19900220 |