EP0499155 - Organotin compositions, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Bundesstrasse 175 A-8402 Werndorf / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states Vianova Kunstharz Aktiengesellschaft Bundesstrasse 175 A-8402 Werndorf / AT | ||
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states Vianova Kunstharz Aktiengesellschaft A-8402 Werndorf / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paar, Willibald, Dr. Schanzelgasse 19 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Hönig, Helmut, Dr. Seebachergasse 10 A-8010 Graz / AT | [1992/34] | Application number, filing date | 92102040.0 | 07.02.1992 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | AT19910000294 | 12.02.1991 Original published format: AT 29491 | [1992/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499155 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/22, C09D5/44, C08G18/24 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
C07F7/2224 (EP,US);
C08G18/242 (EP,US);
C08G18/3844 (EP,US);
C09D5/44 (KR);
C09D5/4492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/34] | Title | German: | Organozinn-Zubereitungen, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1992/34] | English: | Organotin compositions, process for their preparation and their use | [1992/34] | French: | Compositions renfermant des composés organiques d'étain, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1992/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 26.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0261486 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]); | [A]EP0060974 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 112, no. 2, 1990, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 8798T, TOBINAGA, K. ET AL: 'ELECTROPHORETIC AQUEOUS COATINGS CONTAINING AMINE-MODIFIED EPOXIDIZED POLYBUTADIENE', page 68 |