EP0498449 - Semiconductor integrated circuit device having dynamic burn-in circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mano, Hirofumi c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102074.9 | 07.02.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | JP19910004473U | 07.02.1991 Original published format: JP 447391 U | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0498449 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0498449 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
G01R31/2856 (EP);
G01R31/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/33] | Title | German: | Integrierte Halbleiterschaltungsvorrichtung mit dynamischer Einbrennschaltung | [1992/33] | English: | Semiconductor integrated circuit device having dynamic burn-in circuit | [1992/33] | French: | Dispositif de circuit intégré à semi-conducteur comportant un circuit de vieillissement dynamique | [1992/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0408299 ; | [Y]EP0292136 | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 32, no. 4A, September 1989, NEW YORK US pages 22 - 23 'Generic burn-in for LOCST chips' | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 32, no. 8B, January 1990, NEW YORK US pages 303 - 305 'Technique for a 'dynamic' burn-in test' |