EP0505704 - Sealing device for cylindric apparatus, especially to plug pump tubes inside nuclear reactor containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/40] | Sealing device for cylindric apparatus, especially to plug pump tubes inside reactor containers | ||
[1994/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THYSSEN INDUSTRIE AG Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states THYSSEN INDUSTRIE AG Am Thyssenhaus 1 D-45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bierwirth, Helmut Struthbachweg 37A W-3500 Kassel / DE | [1992/40] | Application number, filing date | 92102119.2 | 08.02.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | DE19914108055 | 13.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4108055 | [1992/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505704 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505704 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G21C13/067, F16L55/132 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
G21C13/067 (EP,US);
F16L55/132 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Dichteinrichtung für zylindrische Öffnungen, insbesondere zum Verschliessen von Pumpenstutzen im Innenraum von Kernreaktorbehältern | [1994/46] | English: | Sealing device for cylindric apparatus, especially to plug pump tubes inside nuclear reactor containers | [1994/46] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité pour ouvertures cylindriques, en particulier pour obturer un manchon de pompe à l'intérieur des cuves d'un réacteur nucléaire | [1994/46] |
Former [1992/40] | Dichteinrichtung für zylindrische Öffnungen, insbesondere zum Verschliessen von Pumpenstutzen im Innenraum von Reaktorbehältern | ||
Former [1992/40] | Sealing device for cylindric apparatus, especially to plug pump tubes inside reactor containers | ||
Former [1992/40] | Dispositif d'étanchéité pour ouvertures cylindriques, en particulier pour obturer un monchon de pompe à l'intérieur des cuves d'un réacteur | Examination procedure | 26.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.1992 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1992 | 07.04.1992 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1992 | 07.04.1992 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1992 | 07.04.1992 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1992 | 07.04.1992 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1992 | 07.04.1992 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.07.1995 | GB | 12.07.1995 | SE | 12.10.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/19] | GB | 12.07.1995 | |
SE | 12.10.1995 | ||
FR | 08.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | GB | 12.07.1995 | |
SE | 12.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 12.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR91120E (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [A]GB911758 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [AD]DE3228802 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]) |