EP0499940 - Electromechanic transducer for implantable hearing aids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPLEX GmbH Spezialhörgeräte Münchner Strasse 101 D-85737 Ismaning / DE | [1992/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leysieffer, Hans, Dr.-Ing. Enzianring 13 W-8028 Taufkirchen / DE | 02 /
Hortmann, Günter Robert-Bosch-Strasse 6 W-7449 Neckartenzlingen / DE | 03 /
Baumann, Joachim Hessstrasse 39 W-8000 München 40 / DE | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102209.1 | 10.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | DE19914104358 | 13.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4104358 | [1992/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499940 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499940 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/02 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/18 (EP,US);
H04R25/606 (EP,US);
A61F2002/183 (EP,US);
H04R2225/67 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/35] | Title | German: | Elektromechanischer Wandler für implantierbare Hörgeräte | [1992/35] | English: | Electromechanic transducer for implantable hearing aids | [1992/35] | French: | Transducteur électromécanique pour appareils de correction auditive implantables | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 08.09.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1993 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH627604 (VIENNATONE GMBH [AT]); | [AD]DE3918086 ; | [A]DE3940632 |